AK HB46 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-9)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/31/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-9)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/31/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to regulations adopted by the Department of Administration waiving the commercial motor vehicle driving skills test for certain drivers with military commercial motor vehicle experience.
Title
Waive Cdl Skill Test For Certain Veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House: HB 46 Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House: HB 46 Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/31/13 |
2013-06-24 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/2 CHAPTER 27 SLA 13 |
2013-06-24 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2013-06-24 | House | 4:49 PM 5/24/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-03-29 | Senate | VERSION: HB 46 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2013-03-29 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | COGHILL, MCGUIRE, FAIRCLOUGH, EGAN, STEDMAN, MEYER, STEVENS, ELLIS, HUGGINS |
2013-03-29 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, MICCICHE, DUNLEAVY, KELLY, OLSON, |
2013-03-29 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 46 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-03-29 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-03-29 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2013 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | DP: EGAN, FRENCH, BISHOP, DYSON, FAIRCLOUGH |
2013-03-25 | Senate | TRA RPT 5DP |
2013-03-13 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, GIESSEL, STEDMAN |
2013-03-13 | Senate | STA RPT 5DP |
2013-03-04 | Senate | STA, TRA |
2013-03-04 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-03-01 | House | VERSION: HB 46 |
2013-03-01 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-03-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, GARA, REINBOLD, T.WILSON, STOLTZE |
2013-03-01 | House | PASSED Y33 E7 |
2013-03-01 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 46 |
2013-03-01 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-03-01 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-03-01 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, GATTIS, P.WILSON |
2013-02-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-02-20 | House | DP: LYNN, JOHNSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, GATTIS, ISAACSON, P.WILSON |
2013-02-20 | House | TRA RPT 6DP |
2013-02-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2013-02-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON |
2013-02-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-02-13 | House | DP: HUGHES, ISAACSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, GATTIS, KELLER, LYNN |
2013-02-13 | House | STA RPT 6DP |
2013-02-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KELLER |
2013-02-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2013-02-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2013-01-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA |
2013-01-16 | House | STA, TRA |
2013-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13 |