AK HB44 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/7/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/7/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the practice of accounting.
Title
Practice Of Accounting; Licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - House - House: Rescind Previous Action in Adopting (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Rescind Previous Action in Adopting (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Rescind Previous Action in Adopting (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/7/22 |
2022-06-10 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 5 SLA 22 |
2022-06-02 | House | 12:55 P.M. 6/2/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-02-11 | House | LEGAL MEMO SPREAD ON JOURNAL FAILED Y3 N32 E4 A1 |
2022-02-11 | House | RESCIND ACTION TO SPREAD 2/9 LEGAL MEMO Y34 N1 E4 A1 |
2022-02-09 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1 |
2022-02-09 | House | LEGAL MEMO SPREAD ON JOURNAL UC |
2022-02-09 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-02-04 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2022-02-01 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 44(L&C) AM S |
2022-02-01 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-02-01 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2022-02-01 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y14 N4 E1 A1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2022-02-01 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 44(L&C) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/1 CALENDAR |
2022-01-28 | Senate | L&C SCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-01-28 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-01-28 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 1/28/2022 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(CED) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | NR: REVAK |
2022-01-21 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS |
2022-01-21 | Senate | L&C RPT SCS(L&C) 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | L&C |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-19 | House | VERSION: CSHB 44(STA) |
2021-05-19 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN, SCHRAGE |
2021-05-19 | House | PASSED Y38 N2 |
2021-05-19 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 44(STA) |
2021-05-19 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-19 | House | STA CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-19 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021 |
2021-05-19 | House | LIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1 |
2021-05-13 | House | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2021-05-13 | House | NR: SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-05-13 | House | DP: KAUFMAN, SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, SNYDER, NELSON, FIELDS |
2021-05-13 | House | L&C RPT CS(STA) 6DP 1NR |
2021-03-24 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2021-03-24 | House | AM: EASTMAN |
2021-03-24 | House | DP: CLAMAN, STORY, KAUFMAN, VANCE, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-03-24 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 6DP 1AM |
2021-02-18 | House | STA, L&C |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |
Subjects
Audits
Boards & Commissions
Business
Corporations
Finance
Licensing
Occupations & Professions
Partnerships
Permits
Boards & Commissions
Business
Corporations
Finance
Licensing
Occupations & Professions
Partnerships
Permits