AK HB44 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to campaign expenditures and contributions; relating to the per diem of members of the legislature; relating to limiting gifts by lobbyists to legislators and legislative employees; requiring a legislator to abstain from taking or withholding official action or exerting official influence that could benefit or harm an immediate family member or certain employers; requiring a legislator to request to be excused from voting in an instance where the legislator may have a financial conflict of interest; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislature: Ethics, Conflicts, Per Diem

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Take up Reconsideration Same Day (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clauses (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 5 (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 7 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 10 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 Sustain Ruling of the Chair (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
2018-05-11HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-11HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 19
2018-05-11HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 N1
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-05-10HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-05-09SenateVERSION: SCS CSSSHB 44(STA)
2018-05-09SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-05-09SenateRECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
2018-05-08SenateRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY FLD Y13 N6 E1
2018-05-08SenateBEGICH NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-05-08SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI
2018-05-08SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-08SenatePASSED Y13 N6 E1
2018-05-08SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSSSHB 44(STA)
2018-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-08SenateSTA SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-08SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-08SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2018
2018-04-30SenateFIN REFERRAL REMOVED
2018-04-25SenateFN2: ZERO(LEG)
2018-04-25SenateNR: WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, SHOWER
2018-04-25SenateDNP: COGHILL
2018-04-25SenateJUD RPT SCS(STA) 1DNP 3NR
2018-03-28SenateFN2: ZERO(LEG)
2018-03-28SenateNR: GIESSEL, EGAN, COGHILL
2018-03-28SenateDNP: WILSON
2018-03-28SenateDP: MEYER
2018-03-28SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 19
2018-03-28SenateSTA RPT SCS 1DP 1DNP 3NR NEW TITLE
2018-03-23SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
2017-04-10SenateSTA, JUD
2017-04-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-08HouseVERSION: CSSSHB 44(STA)
2017-04-08HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-08HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2017-04-08HousePASSED Y24 N15 E1
2017-04-08HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-04-08HouseAM NO 5 FAILED Y14 N25 E1
2017-04-08HouseAM 1 TO AM 5 FAILED Y14 N24 E1 A1
2017-04-08HouseAM NO 5 OFFERED
2017-04-08HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
2017-04-08HouseAM NO 4 FAILED Y7 N32 E1
2017-04-08HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y10 N29 E1
2017-04-08HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2017-04-08HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y15 N24 E1
2017-04-08HouseSUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y23 N16 E1
2017-04-08HouseAM NO 1 RULED OUT OF ORDER, UR 35
2017-04-08HouseAM NO 1 OFFERED
2017-04-08HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS 1 & 2 UC
2017-04-08HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 44(STA)
2017-04-07HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/8 CALENDAR
2017-04-07HouseSTA CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-07HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-07HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2017
2017-04-03HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-04-03HouseNR: JOHNSON, WOOL, KNOPP
2017-04-03HouseDNP: BIRCH
2017-04-03HouseDP: LEDOUX, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-04-03HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) NT 3DP 1DNP 3NR
2017-02-08HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-02-08HouseAM: KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, CLAMAN
2017-02-08HouseDNP: KOPP, EASTMAN, REINBOLD
2017-02-08HouseDP: LEDOUX
2017-02-08HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) 1DP 3DNP 3AM
2017-01-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
2017-01-25HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA
2017-01-25HouseJUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) FOR SSHB 44
2017-01-25HouseBILL REPRINTED 1/25/17
2017-01-25HouseSTA REPLACES FIN REFERRAL
2017-01-23HouseJUD, FIN
2017-01-23HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-23HouseSPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
2017-01-18HouseJUD, FIN
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB44
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0044A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0044B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0044C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0044D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0044E.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB44&jrn=0938&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB44&jrn=0939&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB44&jrn=0940&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB44&jrn=0942&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB44&jrn=0943&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB44&jrn=0945&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB44&jrn=3004&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB44&jrn=3006&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB44&jrn=3011&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB44&jrn=3684&hse=H

Bill Comments

feedback