AK HB44 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to campaign expenditures and contributions; relating to the per diem of members of the legislature; relating to limiting gifts by lobbyists to legislators and legislative employees; requiring a legislator to abstain from taking or withholding official action or exerting official influence that could benefit or harm an immediate family member or certain employers; requiring a legislator to request to be excused from voting in an instance where the legislator may have a financial conflict of interest; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Legislature: Ethics, Conflicts, Per Diem
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Take up Reconsideration Same Day (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clauses (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 5 (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 7 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 10 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 Sustain Ruling of the Chair (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Take up Reconsideration Same Day (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clauses (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 5 (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 7 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 10 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 Sustain Ruling of the Chair (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/18 |
2018-07-23 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/19 CHAPTER 61 SLA 18 |
2018-07-09 | House | 1:37 PM 7/9/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-05-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2018-05-11 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 19 |
2018-05-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 N1 |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2018-05-10 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2018-05-09 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSSSHB 44(STA) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2018-05-09 | Senate | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2018-05-08 | Senate | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY FLD Y13 N6 E1 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | BEGICH NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-05-08 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI |
2018-05-08 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | PASSED Y13 N6 E1 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSSSHB 44(STA) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-08 | Senate | STA SCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-08 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-08 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2018 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL REMOVED |
2018-04-25 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, SHOWER |
2018-04-25 | Senate | DNP: COGHILL |
2018-04-25 | Senate | JUD RPT SCS(STA) 1DNP 3NR |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | NR: GIESSEL, EGAN, COGHILL |
2018-03-28 | Senate | DNP: WILSON |
2018-03-28 | Senate | DP: MEYER |
2018-03-28 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 19 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | STA RPT SCS 1DP 1DNP 3NR NEW TITLE |
2018-03-23 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD |
2017-04-10 | Senate | STA, JUD |
2017-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-04-08 | House | VERSION: CSSSHB 44(STA) |
2017-04-08 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-04-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2017-04-08 | House | PASSED Y24 N15 E1 |
2017-04-08 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2017-04-08 | House | AM NO 5 FAILED Y14 N25 E1 |
2017-04-08 | House | AM 1 TO AM 5 FAILED Y14 N24 E1 A1 |
2017-04-08 | House | AM NO 5 OFFERED |
2017-04-08 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2017-04-08 | House | AM NO 4 FAILED Y7 N32 E1 |
2017-04-08 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y10 N29 E1 |
2017-04-08 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC |
2017-04-08 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y15 N24 E1 |
2017-04-08 | House | SUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y23 N16 E1 |
2017-04-08 | House | AM NO 1 RULED OUT OF ORDER, UR 35 |
2017-04-08 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2017-04-08 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS 1 & 2 UC |
2017-04-08 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 44(STA) |
2017-04-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/8 CALENDAR |
2017-04-07 | House | STA CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-07 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-07 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2017 |
2017-04-03 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2017-04-03 | House | NR: JOHNSON, WOOL, KNOPP |
2017-04-03 | House | DNP: BIRCH |
2017-04-03 | House | DP: LEDOUX, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2017-04-03 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 3DP 1DNP 3NR |
2017-02-08 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2017-02-08 | House | AM: KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, CLAMAN |
2017-02-08 | House | DNP: KOPP, EASTMAN, REINBOLD |
2017-02-08 | House | DP: LEDOUX |
2017-02-08 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 1DP 3DNP 3AM |
2017-01-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2017-01-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA |
2017-01-25 | House | JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) FOR SSHB 44 |
2017-01-25 | House | BILL REPRINTED 1/25/17 |
2017-01-25 | House | STA REPLACES FIN REFERRAL |
2017-01-23 | House | JUD, FIN |
2017-01-23 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-23 | House | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED |
2017-01-18 | House | JUD, FIN |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17 |