AK HB44 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - MEMBERS: MACKINNON, GARDNER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - MEMBERS: MACKINNON, GARDNER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to course mastery requirements; relating to the duties of the Department of Education and Early Development; relating to questionnaires administered in a public school; relating to the duties of school districts and regional educational attendance areas; relating to teacher certification requirements; relating to training for school employees and mandatory reporters of child abuse or neglect; relating to physical examinations for students; relating to sexual abuse and sexual assault awareness and prevention efforts in public schools; relating to dating violence and abuse awareness and prevention efforts in public schools; relating to national criminal history record check requirements for employees of child care facilities and residential child care facilities; relating to mandatory reporters of child abuse or neglect; repealing the requirement for secondary students to take college and career readiness assessments; establishing the Alaska Safe Children's Act Task Force; relating to suicide prevention training; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Sex Abuse/assault/dating Viol Prev. Progs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate: SCS CSHB 44(FIN) Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate: SCS CSHB 44(FIN) Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-30 | Senate | MEMBERS: MACKINNON, GARDNER |
2015-09-10 | House | MEMBERS: MILLETT, EDGMON |
2015-09-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2015-09-10 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/9 CHAPTER 2 SSSLA 15 |
2015-09-10 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2015-09-10 | House | 3:00 PM 6/23/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, LEDOUX, THOMPSON |
2015-06-11 | House | COSPONSOR REMOVED: GARA |
2015-06-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-06-11 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N1 E1 A1 |
2015-06-11 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 44(FIN) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2015-06-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | BISHOP, EGAN, MACKINNON, HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, COGHILL, MEYER |
2015-06-11 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, GARDNER, WIELECHOWSKI, ELLIS, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 44(FIN) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-06-11 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2015-06-11 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-06-11 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 6/11/2015 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | FN5: (S.FIN/EED) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | FN4: (EED) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DHS) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MACKINNON, OLSON, HOFFMAN, MICCICHE, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 7DP NEW TITLE |
2015-05-21 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DHS) |
2015-05-21 | Senate | FN2: (EED) |
2015-05-21 | Senate | AM: STEVENS |
2015-05-21 | Senate | DP: DUNLEAVY, GIESSEL, HUGGINS |
2015-05-21 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 201 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | EDC RPT SCS 3DP 1AM NEW TITLE |
2015-05-21 | Senate | SECOND SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2015-04-28 | House | FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2015-04-28 | Senate | FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2015-04-19 | Senate | EDC, FIN |
2015-04-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-04-18 | House | VERSION: CSHB 44(FIN) |
2015-04-18 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-04-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, TUCK, KITO, KAWASAKI, GRUENBERG, SEATON, OLSON, CLAMAN |
2015-04-18 | House | PASSED Y34 N6 |
2015-04-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 44(FIN) |
2015-04-18 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-04-18 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-18 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2015 |
2015-04-18 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2015-04-18 | House | NR: SADDLER, PRUITT, WILSON, GATTIS, THOMPSON |
2015-04-18 | House | DP: GARA, KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG, EDGMON, MUNOZ, NEUMAN |
2015-04-18 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 5NR |
2015-04-18 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2015-04-18 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT |
2015-04-17 | House | EDC REFERRAL WAIVED |
2015-04-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): VAZQUEZ |
2015-04-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2015-01-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER |
2015-01-21 | House | EDC, FIN |
2015-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/15 |