AK HB43 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to prescribing, dispensing, and administering an investigational drug, biological product, or device by physicians for patients who are terminally ill for the purpose of sustaining the patient's life; providing immunity related to manufacturing, distributing, or providing investigational drugs, biological products, or devices; and relating to licensed health care facility requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New Drugs For The Terminally Ill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/18
2018-07-16HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 53 SLA 18
2018-07-09House1:37 PM 7/9/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-04-28HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-04-25SenateVERSION: CSHB 43(JUD)
2018-04-25SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-25SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF
2018-04-25SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-04-25SenateMICCICHE, GARDNER, HUGHES, BEGICH, EGAN, MEYER
2018-04-25SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, SHOWER, COSTELLO, GIESSEL, BISHOP, MACKINNON
2018-04-25SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 43(JUD)
2018-04-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-25SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-25SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2018
2018-03-28SenateFN2: ZERO(CED)
2018-03-28SenateNR: COSTELLO, KELLY, SHOWER
2018-03-28SenateDP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI
2018-03-28SenateJUD RPT 2DP 3NR
2018-01-31SenateFN2: ZERO(CED)
2018-01-31SenateNR: MICCICHE
2018-01-31SenateDP: VON IMHOF, BEGICH, GIESSEL
2018-01-31SenateHSS RPT 3DP 1NR
2017-04-11SenateHSS, JUD
2017-04-11SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-10HouseVERSION: CSHB 43(JUD)
2017-04-10HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, KNOPP, TARR, JOSEPHSON, TILTON, RAUSCHER
2017-04-10HousePASSED Y40
2017-04-10HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 43(JUD)
2017-04-10HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2017-04-10HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2017-04-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FANSLER, PARISH
2017-04-09HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR
2017-04-09HouseJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-09HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-09HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2017
2017-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, EASTMAN
2017-04-05HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-04-05HouseNR: REINBOLD
2017-04-05HouseDP: EASTMAN, KOPP, FANSLER, LEDOUX, CLAMAN
2017-04-05HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1NR
2017-03-08HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-03-08HouseAM: EASTMAN
2017-03-08HouseNR: KITO
2017-03-08HouseDP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SPOHNHOLZ
2017-03-08HouseHSS RPT 5DP 1NR 1AM
2017-01-18HouseHSS, JUD
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback