AK HB416 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the compensation of certain executive branch employees not covered by collective bargaining agreements.
Title
Bonuses For Nonunion Public Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Table (Y: 15 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Table (Y: 15 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Table (Y: 15 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Table (Y: 15 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-08 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/22 |
2022-07-08 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 35 SLA 22 |
2022-06-30 | House | 4:30 P.M. 6/30/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-17 | Senate | VERSION: HB 416(EFD FLD) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED Y15 N3 E1 A1 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 416(EFD FLD) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RULES TO FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | NR: HOFFMAN, WILSON, VON IMHOF |
2022-05-17 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 3NR |
2022-05-16 | Senate | FIN |
2022-05-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-05-16 | House | VERSION: HB 416(EFD FLD) |
2022-05-16 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-05-16 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2022-05-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y24 N16 |
2022-05-16 | House | PASSED Y23 N17 |
2022-05-16 | House | CALL FOR THE QUESTION UC |
2022-05-16 | House | MOTION TO TABLE FAILED Y15 N25 |
2022-05-16 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 416 |
2022-05-16 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2022-05-15 | House | HELD TO 5/16 CALENDAR |
2022-05-14 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CALENDAR |
2022-05-14 | House | SESSION CANCELED 5/13 - ON 5/14 CALENDAR |
2022-05-14 | House | SESSION CANCELED 5/12 - ON 5/13 CALENDAR |
2022-05-11 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CALENDAR |
2022-05-11 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-11 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2022 |
2022-05-04 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2022-05-04 | House | NR: THOMPSON, JOHNSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK |
2022-05-04 | House | DNP: CARPENTER |
2022-05-04 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER |
2022-05-04 | House | FIN RPT 6DP 1DNP 4NR |
2022-04-13 | House | FIN |
2022-04-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |