AK HB416 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/8/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/8/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act adopting and relating to the Uniform Prudent Management of Institutional Funds Act; relating to the investment of money for charitable purposes by institutions, including governmental institutions; and relating to the University of Alaska.
Title
Prudent Management Of Institutional Funds
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/8/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/10 CHAPTER 66 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:19 PM 6/7/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: HB 416 | |
2010-04-18 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 416 | |
2010-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010 | |
2010-04-18 | FN2: ZERO(UA) | |
2010-04-18 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-04-18 | NR: OLSON | |
2010-04-18 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2010-04-18 | FIN RPT 5DP 1NR | |
2010-04-13 | FIN | |
2010-04-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-12 | VERSION: HB 416 | |
2010-04-12 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-12 | PASSED Y37 A3 | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 416 | |
2010-04-12 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-12 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2010 | |
2010-04-11 | FN2: ZERO(UA) | |
2010-04-11 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-04-11 | SALMON, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-04-11 | DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, AUSTERMAN, JOULE, N.FOSTER, KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH, | |
2010-04-11 | FIN RPT 11DP | |
2010-04-06 | FN2: ZERO(UA) | |
2010-04-06 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-04-06 | NR: BUCH, T.WILSON | |
2010-04-06 | DP: LYNN, HOLMES, OLSON | |
2010-04-06 | L&C RPT 3DP 2NR | |
2010-03-17 | L&C, FIN | |
2010-03-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorney General
Civil Procedure
Financial Institutions
Funds
Investments
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Finance
Trusts
Uniform Acts
Universities
Civil Procedure
Financial Institutions
Funds
Investments
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Finance
Trusts
Uniform Acts
Universities