AK HB411 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - REFERRED TO RESOURCES
Pending: House Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - REFERRED TO RESOURCES
Pending: House Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the power project fund; authorizing the Alaska Energy Authority to charge and collect fees relating to the power project fund; authorizing the Alaska Energy Authority to sell and authorizing the Alaska Industrial Development and Export Authority to purchase loans of the power project fund; providing legislative approval for the sale and purchase of loans of the power project fund under the memorandum of understanding dated February 17, 2010; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Power Project Fund
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | REFERRED TO RESOURCES | |
2010-03-17 | FN4: INDETERMINATE(CED) | |
2010-03-17 | FN3: ZERO(DOT) | |
2010-03-17 | FN2: ZERO(REV) | |
2010-03-17 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-03-17 | DP: RAMRAS, DAHLSTROM, PETERSEN, TUCK, MILLETT, EDGMON | |
2010-03-17 | ENE RPT 6DP | |
2010-03-08 | FN4: INDETERMINATE(CED) CORRECTED | |
2010-03-08 | FN1: ZERO(CED) CORRECTED | |
2010-02-26 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2010-02-26 | FN4: INDETERMINATE(CED) | |
2010-02-26 | FN3: ZERO(DOT) | |
2010-02-26 | FN2: ZERO(REV) | |
2010-02-26 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-02-26 | ENE, RES, FIN | |
2010-02-26 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=26&bill=HB411 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/26/Bills/HB0411A.PDF |