AK HB41 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to joint prime sponsorship of bills.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Prime Sponsorship Of Bills

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2018-04-10SenateSTA
2018-04-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-09HouseVERSION: CSHB 41(FIN)
2018-04-09HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-09HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y27 N11 E1 A1
2018-04-09HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2018-04-09HouseMILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-04-09HousePASSED Y26 N12 E2
2018-04-09HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
2018-04-06HouseHELD TO 4/9 CALENDAR
2018-04-06HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2018-04-06HouseAM NO 5 FAILED Y17 N19 E4
2018-04-06HouseAM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N21 E4
2018-04-06HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y17 N19 E4
2018-04-06HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y17 N19 E4
2018-04-06HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
2018-04-06HouseAM NO 2 OFFERED AND PENDING
2018-04-06HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N23 E2
2018-04-06HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2018-04-06HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 41(FIN)
2018-04-06HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2018-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, JOSEPHSON
2018-04-05HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/6 CALENDAR
2018-04-05HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-05HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-05HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2018
2018-04-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): WILSON, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-04HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-04-04HouseNR: PRUITT, GUTTENBERG, TILTON
2018-04-04HouseDP: WILSON, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-04HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 3NR
2017-01-18HouseFIN
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback