AK HB41 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to joint prime sponsorship of bills.
Title
Joint Prime Sponsorship Of Bills
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2018-04-10 | Senate | STA |
2018-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-09 | House | VERSION: CSHB 41(FIN) |
2018-04-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-09 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y27 N11 E1 A1 |
2018-04-09 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2018-04-09 | House | MILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-04-09 | House | PASSED Y26 N12 E2 |
2018-04-09 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-06 | House | HELD TO 4/9 CALENDAR |
2018-04-06 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 5 FAILED Y17 N19 E4 |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N21 E4 |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y17 N19 E4 |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y17 N19 E4 |
2018-04-06 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 2 OFFERED AND PENDING |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N23 E2 |
2018-04-06 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC |
2018-04-06 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 41(FIN) |
2018-04-06 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2018-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, JOSEPHSON |
2018-04-05 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/6 CALENDAR |
2018-04-05 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-05 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-05 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-04 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-04-04 | House | NR: PRUITT, GUTTENBERG, TILTON |
2018-04-04 | House | DP: WILSON, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-04 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 3NR |
2017-01-18 | House | FIN |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17 |