AK HB4002 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-11 - FN2: (ADM/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-11 - FN2: (ADM/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to major medical insurance coverage under the Public Employees' Retirement System of Alaska for certain surviving spouses and dependent children of peace officers and firefighters; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Ins. For Depends. Of Deceased Fire/police
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | House | FN2: (ADM/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS) |
2016-07-11 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 256 |
2016-07-11 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/28/16 |
2016-07-11 | House | FN2: (ADM/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS)(CORRECTED) RECEIVED |
2016-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2016-06-19 | Senate | STA, FIN |
2016-06-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-06-18 | House | VERSION: CSHB 4002(FIN) |
2016-06-18 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2016-06-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-06-18 | House | PASSED Y34 E6 |
2016-06-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 4002(FIN) |
2016-06-18 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-06-18 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-06-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-06-18 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 6/18/2016 |
2016-06-18 | House | FN(S) FORTHCOMING [FN2: (ADM) IN FN PACKET] |
2016-06-18 | House | NR: SADDLER, PRUITT, GATTIS, WILSON, NEUMAN |
2016-06-18 | House | DP: KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG, GARA, EDGMON, MUNOZ, THOMPSON |
2016-06-18 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 5NR |
2016-06-13 | House | L&C REFERRAL WAIVED |
2016-05-23 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2016-05-23 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2016-05-23 | House | L&C, FIN |
2016-05-23 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |