AK HB400 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the collection of fees by the Department of Public Safety for fire and explosion prevention and safety services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees For Fire Prevention Measures

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-04-23SenateFN2: (DPS)
2018-04-23SenateDP: BISHOP, STEVENS
2018-04-23SenateNR: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, OLSON, MICCICHE
2018-04-23SenateFIN RPT 2DP 4NR
2018-04-10SenateFIN
2018-04-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-09HouseVERSION: HB 400
2018-04-09HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-09HousePASSED Y38 E2
2018-04-09HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 400
2018-04-06HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR
2018-04-06HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-06HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2018
2018-04-04HouseFN1: INDETERMINATE(DPS)
2018-04-04HouseAM: KAWASAKI
2018-04-04HouseNR: ORTIZ, PRUITT, TILTON, GUTTENBERG
2018-04-04HouseDP: THOMPSON, WILSON, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-04HouseFIN RPT 5DP 4NR 1AM
2018-03-19HouseFN1: INDETERMINATE(DPS)
2018-03-19HouseNR: BIRCH, LEDOUX, WOOL
2018-03-19HouseDNP: KNOPP, JOHNSON
2018-03-19HouseDP: KREISS-TOMKINS
2018-03-19HouseSTA RPT 1DP 2DNP 3NR
2018-02-28HouseSTA, FIN
2018-02-28HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback