AK HB40 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - RETURNED TO GOVERNOR FOR PERMANENT FILING
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - RETURNED TO GOVERNOR FOR PERMANENT FILING
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations for the operating and capital expenses of the state's integrated comprehensive mental health program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Approp: Mental Health Budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-10 - House - House: Override Line Item Vetoes (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Adopt the Conference Committee Report (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-09 - House - House: Adopt (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Adopt the Conference Committee Report (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-09 - House - House: Adopt (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | RETURNED TO GOVERNOR FOR PERMANENT FILING |
2019-07-10 | House | GOVERNOR LINE ITEM VETOES SUSTAINED Y37 N1 E4 A18 |
2019-07-10 | House | MOTION TO OVERRIDE LINE ITEM VETOES |
2019-07-08 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/19 |
2019-07-08 | House | PARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS |
2019-07-08 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/28 CHAPTER 2 FSSLA 19 |
2019-07-08 | House | LETTER TO AMHTA PER AS 37.14.005(C) |
2019-07-08 | House | 4:50 P.M. 6/13/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-12 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y20 N- |
2019-06-10 | Senate | CC RPT ADPTD Y20 N- CCS SSHB 40 |
2019-06-09 | Senate | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT READ |
2019-06-09 | Senate | CC REPORT: CCS SSHB 40 RECEIVED 6/8/19 9:24 P.M. |
2019-06-09 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-06-09 | House | CC RPT ADPTD Y35 N2 E3 CCS SSHB 40 |
2019-06-09 | House | CC REPORT TAKEN UP UC |
2019-06-09 | House | CC REPORT: CCS SSHB 40 RECEIVED 6/8/19 9:23 P.M. |
2019-06-09 | House | CC REPORT READ AND HELD |
2019-05-16 | Senate | FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2019-05-15 | House | FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2019-05-08 | House | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2019-05-08 | Senate | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2019-05-06 | Senate | STEDMAN (CHAIR), VON IMHOF, OLSON |
2019-05-06 | Senate | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2019-05-06 | Senate | FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N19 E1 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | RECEDE MESSAGE READ |
2019-05-03 | House | FOSTER (CHAIR), WILSON, TILTON |
2019-05-03 | House | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2019-05-03 | House | FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N38 E2 |
2019-05-03 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2019-05-02 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2019-05-01 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSSSHB 40(FIN) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2019-05-01 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-01 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2019-05-01 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSSSHB 40(FIN) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR |
2019-04-30 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2019-04-30 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-30 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, WILSON |
2019-04-29 | Senate | AM: STEDMAN, OLSON |
2019-04-29 | Senate | DP: VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, BISHOP |
2019-04-29 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 4DP 2NR 2AM SAME TITLE |
2019-04-12 | Senate | FIN |
2019-04-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-04-11 | House | VERSION: CSSSHB 40(FIN) |
2019-04-11 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2019-04-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y33 N5 E2 |
2019-04-11 | House | PASSED Y24 N14 E2 |
2019-04-11 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 40(FIN) |
2019-04-11 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-04-11 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2019-04-11 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2019-04-10 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 4/10 - ON 4/11 CALENDAR |
2019-04-10 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2019-04-09 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 4/9 - ON 4/10 CALENDAR |
2019-04-08 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/9 CALENDAR |
2019-04-08 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2019-04-08 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-08 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | AM: TILTON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD |
2019-04-08 | House | NR: CARPENTER, MERRICK |
2019-04-08 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, LEBON, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, WILSON, FOSTER |
2019-04-08 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 2NR 2AM |
2019-02-21 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2019-02-21 | House | FIN |
2019-02-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-02-21 | House | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED |
2019-02-20 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2019-02-20 | House | FIN |
2019-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alcohol
Appropriations
Budget
Capital Projects
Corrections
Courts
Disabilities
Drugs
Foster Care
Grants
Health & Social Services
Housing
Labor Relations
Medical Care
Mental Health
Pioneers' Homes
Public Assistance
Public Employees
Salaries & Allowances
Senior Citizens
Universities
Vocational Training
Appropriations
Budget
Capital Projects
Corrections
Courts
Disabilities
Drugs
Foster Care
Grants
Health & Social Services
Housing
Labor Relations
Medical Care
Mental Health
Pioneers' Homes
Public Assistance
Public Employees
Salaries & Allowances
Senior Citizens
Universities
Vocational Training