AK HB4 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to elections.
Title
Elections:repeal Rank Choice/open Primary
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Vance [R] | Rep. George Rauscher [R] | Rep. Kevin McCabe [R] | Rep. Frank Tomaszewski [R] |
Rep. Benjamin Carpenter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER |
2024-01-18 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-18 | House | FN2: (H.JUD/GOV) |
2024-01-18 | House | NR: C.JOHNSON |
2024-01-18 | House | DNP: GRAY, GROH |
2024-01-18 | House | DP: EASTMAN, ALLARD, CARPENTER, VANCE |
2024-01-18 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2DNP 1NR |
2023-05-10 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD |
2023-05-10 | House | FN1: (GOV) |
2023-05-10 | House | DNP: STORY |
2023-05-10 | House | DP: ALLARD, CARPENTER, WRIGHT, SHAW |
2023-05-10 | House | STA RPT 4DP 1DNP |
2023-05-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TOMASZEWSKI |
2023-01-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE |
2023-01-19 | House | STA, JUD |
2023-01-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-01-19 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB4 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0004A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0004B.PDF |