AK HB4 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/12/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/12/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to automated external defibrillators.
Title
Automated External Defibrillator
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/12/15 |
2015-05-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/14 CHAPTER 19 SLA 15 |
2015-04-27 | House | 12:12 PM 4/27/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-04-15 | Senate | VERSION: HB 4 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2015-04-15 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 4 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-04-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | JUD REFERRAL WAIVED |
2015-04-11 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, STOLTZE, GIESSEL, ELLIS |
2015-04-11 | Senate | HSS RPT 4DP |
2015-04-09 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL |
2015-02-13 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE, EGAN, MICCICHE, MEYER |
2015-02-13 | Senate | HSS, JUD |
2015-02-13 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-02-11 | House | VERSION: HB 4 |
2015-02-11 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-02-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON |
2015-02-11 | House | PASSED Y37 E3 |
2015-02-11 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 4 |
2015-02-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON |
2015-02-09 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/11 CALENDAR |
2015-02-09 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-02-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/9/2015 |
2015-02-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN |
2015-02-06 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2015-02-06 | House | NR: GRUENBERG |
2015-02-06 | House | DP: KELLER, MILLETT, CLAMAN, LEDOUX |
2015-02-06 | House | JUD RPT 4DP 1NR |
2015-02-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT |
2015-01-21 | House | JUD |
2015-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/15 |