AK HB392 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing a loan repayment program and employment incentive program for certain health care professionals employed in the state; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Incentives For Certain Medical Providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI | |
2010-04-08 | COSPONSOR(S): GARA | |
2010-03-30 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-03-30 | FN1: (DHS) | |
2010-03-30 | NR: HOLMES, T.WILSON, KELLER | |
2010-03-30 | DP: SEATON, LYNN, HERRON | |
2010-03-30 | HSS RPT CS(HSS) 3DP 3NR | |
2010-02-23 | HSS, FIN | |
2010-02-23 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Dentists
Education
Employment
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Labor
Loans
Medical Care
Mental Health
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians
Psychologists
State Aid
Unorganized Borough
Education
Employment
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Labor
Loans
Medical Care
Mental Health
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians
Psychologists
State Aid
Unorganized Borough