AK HB384 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the Regulatory Commission of Alaska and broadband Internet regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory Comm Of Ak; Broadband Internet

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2018-04-30SenateSTA, L&C
2018-04-30SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-27HouseVERSION: HB 384
2018-04-27HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-27HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y21 N17 E2
2018-04-27HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2018-04-27HouseTUCK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-04-27HouseFAILED PASSAGE Y20 N17 E2 A1
2018-04-27HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 384
2018-04-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
2018-04-26HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR
2018-04-26HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-26HouseSESSION CANCELED 4/25 - ON 4/26 CALENDAR
2018-04-23HouseHELD TO 4/25 CALENDAR
2018-04-23HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/2018
2018-04-12HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2018-04-12HouseAM: KAWASAKI
2018-04-12HouseNR: ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GRENN
2018-04-12HouseDNP: WILSON, TILTON, PRUITT
2018-04-12HouseDP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-12HouseFIN RPT 4DP 3DNP 3NR 1AM
2018-04-02HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2018-04-02HouseNR: JOSEPHSON, KITO
2018-04-02HouseDP: WOOL, EDGMON
2018-04-02HouseL&C RPT 2DP 2NR
2018-02-21HouseL&C, FIN
2018-02-21HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback