AK HB383 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Travel Alaska Board; relating to a tourism marketing assessment; and establishing a tourism marketing fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tourism Marketing:board;assessment;fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-04-04HouseFN5: (DOT)
2018-04-04HouseFN4: (DOT)
2018-04-04HouseFN3: (REV)
2018-04-04HouseFN2: (DNR)
2018-04-04HouseFN1: (CED)
2018-04-04HouseAM: NEUMAN
2018-04-04HouseNR: EDGMON, LINCOLN
2018-04-04HouseDNP: KNOPP, TUCK, TALERICO
2018-04-04HouseDP: JOSEPHSON
2018-04-04HouseAET RPT CS(AET) NT 1DP 3DNP 2NR 1AM
2018-03-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR
2018-02-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2018-02-21HouseAET, FIN
2018-02-21HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback