AK HB383 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the membership of the board of the Alaska Gasline Development Corporation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Ak Gasline Development Corp. Bd Members
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clause (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Advance from Second to Third Reading? (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Advance from Second to Third Reading? (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Advance from Second to Third Reading? (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Advance from Second to Third Reading? (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2014-04-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 4/16 CHAPTER 7 SLA 14 |
2014-04-16 | House | 8:55 AM 4/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-15 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 383(RLS) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-15 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y16 N4 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | PASSED Y13 N7 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 383(RLS) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y16 N4 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-12 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-04-12 | Senate | DNP: WIELECHOWSKI |
2014-04-12 | Senate | DP: DYSON, COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2014-04-12 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP 1DNP |
2014-04-11 | Senate | STA |
2014-04-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-09 | House | VERSION: CSHB 383(RLS) |
2014-04-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-09 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-09 | House | PASSED Y27 N12 E1 |
2014-04-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 383(RLS) |
2014-04-09 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-09 | House | RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-09 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-09 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-04-09 | House | DP: HAWKER, GRUENBERG, HERRON, OLSON, CHENAULT, KELLER, JOHNSON |
2014-04-09 | House | RLS RPT CS(RLS) 7DP |
2014-04-04 | House | RLS |
2014-04-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |