AK HB38 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the payment of workers' compensation benefits in the case of permanent partial impairment; relating to the payment of workers' compensation death benefits payable to a child of an employee where there is no surviving spouse; relating to the payment of workers' compensation death benefits for an employee without a surviving spouse or child; and relating to notice of workers' compensation death benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Comp: Death;perm Partial Impair

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-04-06SenateFIN
2018-04-06SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-05HouseVERSION: CSHB 38(FIN) AM(EFD FLD)
2018-04-05HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, PARISH
2018-04-05House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2018-04-05HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y23 N16 E1
2018-04-05HousePASSED Y21 N18 E1
2018-04-05HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING AND PENDING
2018-04-05HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 38(FIN) AM
2018-04-05HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2018-04-04HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/5 CALENDAR
2018-04-04HouseAM NO 2 ADOPTED Y24 N15 E1
2018-04-04HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N26 E1
2018-04-04HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-04HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-04HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 04/04/18
2018-04-05HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2018-03-07HouseBILL REPRINTED 3/7/18
2018-03-07HouseCOSPONSOR REMOVED: RAUSCHER
2018-03-02HouseFN5: (GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS)
2018-03-02HouseFN4: (ADM)
2018-03-02HouseFN3: ZERO(LWF)
2018-03-02HouseAM: WILSON, KAWASAKI, THOMPSON, PRUITT, GRENN, TILTON, SEATON
2018-03-02HouseNR: ORTIZ
2018-03-02HouseDP: GARA, FOSTER
2018-03-02HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 2DP 1NR 7AM
2018-02-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
2018-01-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA
2017-04-28HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK, KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG
2017-04-11HouseFN2: (ADM)
2017-04-11HouseFN1: ZERO(LWF)
2017-04-11HouseNR: WOOL
2017-04-11HouseDNP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH, KNOPP
2017-04-11HouseDP: JOSEPHSON, KITO
2017-04-11HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 2DP 3DNP 1NR
2017-01-18HouseL&C, FIN
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback