AK HB374 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/27/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/27/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to on-bill financing by a utility for certain energy efficiency and conservation improvements.
Title
On-bill Financing Of Energy Improvements
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Wool [D] | Rep. Justin Parish [D] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] |
Rep. Sam Kito [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
Rep. Steve Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-12 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/27/18 |
2018-07-31 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/29 CHAPTER 72 SLA 18 |
2018-07-25 | House | 3:23 PM 7/25/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, THOMPSON |
2018-05-12 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 N1 |
2018-05-12 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2018-05-12 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2018-05-12 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 374(CRA) |
2018-05-12 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2018-05-12 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 374(CRA) |
2018-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-12 | Senate | CRA SCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-12 | Senate | RULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 5/12/18 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-05-01 | Senate | NR: MACKINNON, STEDMAN |
2018-05-01 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, GARDNER, HOFFMAN |
2018-05-01 | Senate | CRA RPT SCS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE |
2018-04-11 | Senate | CRA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | CRA |
2018-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-09 | House | VERSION: CSHB 374(L&C) |
2018-04-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-09 | House | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2018-04-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2018-04-06 | House | CHENAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-04-06 | House | PASSED Y36 N2 E2 |
2018-04-06 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 374(L&C) |
2018-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, GARA, KITO, JOSEPHSON |
2018-04-05 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/6 CALENDAR |
2018-04-05 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-05 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-05 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-04-02 | House | DP: WOOL, JOSEPHSON, EDGMON, KITO |
2018-04-02 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 4DP |
2018-03-09 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-03-09 | House | AM: JOHNSTON, RAUSCHER |
2018-03-09 | House | NR: JOHNSON |
2018-03-09 | House | DP: CLAMAN, WOOL |
2018-03-09 | House | ENE RPT CS(ENE) 2DP 1NR 2AM |
2018-02-21 | House | ENE, L&C |
2018-02-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Buildings
Consumer Affairs
Energy
Environmental Concerns
Finance
Landlord & Tenant
Leases
Municipalities
Public Utilities
Regulatory Actions
Utilities
Buildings
Consumer Affairs
Energy
Environmental Concerns
Finance
Landlord & Tenant
Leases
Municipalities
Public Utilities
Regulatory Actions
Utilities