AK HB374 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to coverage under a state plan provided by the Comprehensive Health Insurance Association; establishing the Alaska comprehensive health insurance fund; relating to a reinsurance program; relating to the definition of 'residents who are high risks'; relating to an application for a waiver for state innovation for health care insurance; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Reinsurance Program; Health Ins. Waivers
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-06-04 - House - House: Concur Effective Date (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-04 - House - House: Concur (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-04 - House - House: Concur (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-20 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2016-07-20 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/18 CHAPTER 5 4SSLA 16 |
2016-07-11 | House | 11:39 AM 7/6/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-07-11 | House | FN3: (CED) |
2016-07-11 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 256 |
2016-07-11 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/28/16 |
2016-06-04 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y34 E6 |
2016-06-04 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y24 N10 E6 |
2016-06-04 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2016-06-03 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2016-06-03 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2016-06-03 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 374(FIN) |
2016-06-03 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2016-06-03 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-06-03 | Senate | PASSED Y15 N2 E3 |
2016-06-03 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 374(FIN) |
2016-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-06-03 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2016-06-03 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-06-03 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 6/3/2016 |
2016-06-03 | Senate | FN3: (CED) |
2016-06-03 | Senate | NR: MACKINNON, DUNLEAVY, OLSON, MICCICHE |
2016-06-03 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN |
2016-06-03 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 2DP 4NR SAME TITLE |
2016-05-30 | Senate | FIN |
2016-05-30 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-05-30 | House | VERSION: CSHB 374(FIN) |
2016-05-30 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2016-05-30 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-05-30 | House | PASSED Y36 N1 E2 A1 |
2016-05-30 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 374(FIN) |
2016-05-30 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-05-30 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-05-30 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-05-30 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/30/2016 |
2016-05-28 | House | FN3: (CED) |
2016-05-28 | House | NEUMAN |
2016-05-28 | House | NR: SADDLER, KAWASAKI, GATTIS, PRUITT, GARA, WILSON, EDGMON, GUTTENBERG, |
2016-05-28 | House | DP: MUNOZ, THOMPSON |
2016-05-28 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 2DP 9NR |
2016-05-25 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RLS |
2016-05-23 | Senate | FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL - WITH PASSAGE OF HCR 401 |
2016-05-23 | House | FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2016-04-16 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(CED) |
2016-04-16 | House | DP: LEDOUX, TILTON, HUGHES, KITO, COLVER, OLSON |
2016-04-16 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 6DP |
2016-03-25 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2016-03-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2016-03-25 | House | L&C |
2016-03-25 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |