AK HB372 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to insurance; relating to the annual report by the director of insurance; relating to expenses for insurance examinations; relating to regulations for insurance utilization review, benefits determination, health care insurance grievance resolution procedures, independent review of adverse determinations or final adverse determinations, independent review organizations, and continuing education providers; relating to required provisions for health care insurance contracts and policies, including health care provider choice; establishing civil penalties for insurers for failure to provide requested records; amending the definition of 'wet marine and transportation' insurance; amending provisions on limited licenses to include crop insurance; relating to third-party administrator notification requirements; relating to certification filing by reinsurance intermediary brokers; relating to rate filings, delivery of insurance policies or endorsements; relating to refunds of variable life insurance policies and variable annuities; establishing limitations on issuance of long-term care insurance; relating to requirements for group health insurance policies; amending the definition of 'group health insurance'; relating to motor vehicle service contracts; relating to notice requirements for meetings of stockholders or members of a domestic insurer; establishing a definition of 'bona fide association'; relating to requirements and penalties for committing a fraudulent or criminal insurance act; updating criteria for examinations; relating to rate filing deviations; establishing civil penalties for certain wilful violations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Omnibus Insurance
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-20 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2016-07-20 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/18 CHAPTER 41 SLA 16 |
2016-07-11 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2016-07-11 | House | 11:39 AM 7/6/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-04-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-17 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1 |
2016-04-17 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2016-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 372(L&C) |
2016-04-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2016-04-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N2 A1 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 372(L&C) |
2016-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-17 | Senate | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2016-04-17 | Senate | L&C SCS ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/17/16 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2016-04-17 | Senate | AM: GIESSEL |
2016-04-17 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, STEVENS, MEYER |
2016-04-17 | Senate | L&C RPT SCS 3DP 1AM SAME TITLE |
2016-04-14 | Senate | L&C |
2016-04-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-04-13 | House | VERSION: CSHB 372(L&C) AM |
2016-04-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2016-04-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-13 | House | PASSED Y36 E1 A3 |
2016-04-13 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2016-04-13 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-13 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2016-04-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 372(L&C) |
2016-04-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/13 CALENDAR |
2016-04-12 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2016 |
2016-04-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2016-04-07 | House | NR: LEDOUX, TILTON, HUGHES, KITO, JOSEPHSON, COLVER |
2016-04-07 | House | DP: OLSON |
2016-04-07 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 1DP 6NR |
2016-03-21 | House | L&C |
2016-03-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure
Agency
Business
Claims
Consumer Affairs
Fees
Insurance
Medical Care
Physicians
Regulations
Regulatory Actions
Agency
Business
Claims
Consumer Affairs
Fees
Insurance
Medical Care
Physicians
Regulations
Regulatory Actions