AK HB369 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/8/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to restrictions on the criminal prosecution for certain offenses for a person who seeks medical assistance for a person experiencing a drug overdose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug Overdose: Immunity From Prosecution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-25 - House - House: Concur (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-11HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/8/14
2014-07-11HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 72 SLA 14
2014-07-02House9:55 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2014-04-25HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 N3 E2
2014-04-25HouseCONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE
2014-04-25HouseHELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
2014-04-25HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2014-04-25SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 369(JUD)
2014-04-25SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2014-04-24SenateENGROSSED
2014-04-24SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2014-04-24SenateBISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL, STEDMAN, MEYER, ELLIS
2014-04-24SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, DYSON, STEVENS, FAIRCLOUGH, MCGUIRE, GARDNER,
2014-04-24SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 369(JUD)
2014-04-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-24SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
2014-04-24SenateTAKEN UP IN SECOND READING - AM NO 1 PENDING
2014-04-23SenateAM NO 1 - PENDING
2014-04-23SenateHELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/24 CALENDAR
2014-04-23SenateMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2014-04-23SenateAM NO 1 OFFERED
2014-04-23SenateJUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-23SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-22SenateNOT TAKEN UP 4/22 - ON 4/23 CALENDAR
2014-04-21SenateNOT TAKEN UP 4/21 - ON 4/22 CALENDAR
2014-04-21SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/2014
2014-04-11SenateFN4: ZERO(LAW)
2014-04-11SenateFN2: ZERO(ADM)
2014-04-11SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2014-04-11SenateNR: WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON
2014-04-11SenateDP: COGHILL, DYSON
2014-04-11SenateJUD RPT SCS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
2014-03-28SenateJUD
2014-03-28SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2014-03-28HouseVERSION: CSHB 369(JUD)
2014-03-28HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2014-03-28HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y32 N3 E4 A1
2014-03-28HouseRECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
2014-03-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LYNN, OLSON
2014-03-27HouseJOSEPHSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2014-03-27HousePASSED Y28 N4 E4 A4
2014-03-27HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 369(JUD)
2014-03-27HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-03-27HouseJUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-03-27HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-03-27HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2014
2014-03-25HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KITO III
2014-03-24HouseFN3: ZERO(LAW)
2014-03-24HouseFN2: ZERO(ADM)
2014-03-24HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2014-03-24HouseAM: LEDOUX
2014-03-24HouseDP: MILLETT, PRUITT, FOSTER, GRUENBERG, LYNN
2014-03-24HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1AM
2014-03-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, MILLETT, FOSTER
2014-02-26HouseJUD
2014-02-26HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback