AK HB369 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-25 - REPORT RECEIVED 7/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to an in-state natural gas pipeline, the office of in-state gasline project coordinator, and the Joint In-State Gasline Development Team; requiring the development of an in-state natural gas pipeline plan, to be delivered to the legislature by July 1, 2011, that provides for a natural gas pipeline that is operational by December 31, 2015; directing the Joint In-State Gasline Development Team to assume responsibilities under sec. 19, ch. 14, SLA 2009; requiring expedited review and action by state agencies or entities relating to the in-state natural gas pipeline project; clarifying the purpose of the Alaska Natural Gas Development Authority; relating to definitions of certain terms that relate to a project that may be developed by the Alaska Natural Gas Development Authority; relating to an exemption from application of AS 38.35 for certain natural gas carriers; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In-state Pipeline/coordinator/team

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-25 REPORT RECEIVED 7/2011
2010-07-09 EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/27/10
2010-07-09 SIGNED INTO LAW 4/26 CHAPTER 7 SLA 10
2010-07-09 1:48 PM 4/21/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2010-07-09 MANIFEST ERROR(S)
2010-04-18 EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2010-04-18 CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
2010-04-18 TAKE UP CONCUR
2010-04-18 HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
2010-04-18 VERSION: SCS CSHB 369(FIN)
2010-04-18 TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2010-04-18 EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2010-04-18 PASSED Y16 N4
2010-04-18 CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, MENARD
2010-04-18 READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 369(FIN)
2010-04-18 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-18 AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N11
2010-04-18 FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-18 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-04-18 FN5: (REV)
2010-04-18 FN4: (GOV)
2010-04-18 AM: OLSON
2010-04-18 DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS
2010-04-18 FIN RPT SCS 6DP 1AM NEW TITLE
2010-04-18 MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2010-04-18 RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010
2010-04-13 CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, HUGGINS, PASKVAN, MEYER, THOMAS
2010-04-13 FN4: (GOV)
2010-04-13 NR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS, FRENCH, WAGONER
2010-04-13 DP: MCGUIRE, HUGGINS
2010-04-13 TITLE CHANGE: SCR 21
2010-04-13 RES RPT SCS 2DP 4NR NEW TITLE
2010-03-25 RES, FIN
2010-03-25 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2010-03-24 VERSION: CSHB 369(FIN) AM
2010-03-24 TRANSMITTED TO (S)
2010-03-24 COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, PETERSEN, LYNN, NEUMAN, MILLETT, MUNOZ
2010-03-24 EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2010-03-24 PASSED Y38 E2
2010-03-24 READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 369(FIN) AM
2010-03-24 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2010-03-24 AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-03-24 FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-03-24 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-03-24 RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2010
2010-03-24 FN3: (GOV)
2010-03-24 STOLTZE, HAWKER
2010-03-24 DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, KELLY, AUSTERMAN, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH,
2010-03-24 FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 10DP
2010-03-15 COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
2010-03-11 FN2: (DOT)
2010-03-11 FN1: INDETERMINATE(GOV)
2010-03-11 AM: KAWASAKI
2010-03-11 NR: SEATON
2010-03-11 DP: OLSON, P.WILSON, JOHNSON, NEUMAN
2010-03-11 RES RPT CS(RES) NT 4DP 1NR 1AM
2010-03-10 COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
2010-02-26 COSPONSOR(S): OLSON
2010-02-24 COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS
2010-02-23 RES, FIN
2010-02-23 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback