AK HB36 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to an application for a license to operate as a dealer in motor vehicles; relating to the duties of a motor vehicle dealer; and requiring a dealer in motor vehicles to maintain liability and property insurance.
Title
Motor Vehicle Dealers: Applic.; Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House: Concur (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/21 |
2021-08-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 17 SLA 21 |
2021-06-23 | House | 12:10 P.M. 6/22/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-19 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N3 E1 |
2021-05-19 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 6 |
2021-05-19 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2021-05-19 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2021-05-18 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 36(L&C) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N- |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2021-05-18 | Senate | HUGHES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 36(L&C) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-18 | Senate | L&C SCS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE, REVAK, STEVENS |
2021-05-18 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON |
2021-05-18 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 6 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | L&C RPT SCS 2DP 3NR NEW TITLE |
2021-04-16 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2021-04-16 | Senate | AM: KIEHL |
2021-04-16 | Senate | NR: MYERS, SHOWER, MICCICHE |
2021-04-16 | Senate | TRA RPT SCS 3NR 1AM SAME TITLE |
2021-03-26 | Senate | TRA, L&C |
2021-03-26 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-03-25 | House | VERSION: HB 36 |
2021-03-25 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-03-25 | House | PASSED Y29 N10 E1 |
2021-03-25 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2021-03-25 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N22 E1 |
2021-03-25 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2021-03-25 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING |
2021-03-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2021-03-24 | House | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 3/25 CALENDAR |
2021-03-24 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 36 |
2021-03-24 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-03-24 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-03-24 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2021-03-15 | House | DP: SNYDER, NELSON, MCCARTY, SCHRAGE, KAUFMAN, SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-03-15 | House | L&C RPT 6DP |
2021-03-03 | House | FIN REFERRAL REMOVED |
2021-02-18 | House | L&C, FIN |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |
Subjects
Bonds & Bonding
Business
Crimes
Insurance
Liability
Motor Vehicles
Occupations & Professions
Property
Sales
Workers Compensation
Business
Crimes
Insurance
Liability
Motor Vehicles
Occupations & Professions
Property
Sales
Workers Compensation