AK HB358 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, KAWASAKI, OLSON
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, KAWASAKI, OLSON
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the renewable energy grant fund and recommendation program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Renewable Energy Grant Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, KAWASAKI, OLSON |
2022-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-05-12 | Senate | FIN |
2022-05-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-05-11 | House | VERSION: HB 358 |
2022-05-11 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-05-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PATKOTAK, CRONK, TARR, JOSEPHSON, SNYDER |
2022-05-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-11 | House | PASSED Y38 N2 |
2022-05-11 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 358 |
2022-05-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2022-05-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR |
2022-05-10 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2022 |
2022-05-09 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2022-05-09 | House | NR: JOHNSON, MERRICK |
2022-05-09 | House | DP: EDGMON, LEBON, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER |
2022-05-09 | House | FIN RPT 4DP 2NR |
2022-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2022-03-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, HOPKINS |
2022-03-07 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2022-03-07 | House | NR: KAUFMAN, RAUSCHER |
2022-03-07 | House | DP: ZULKOSKY, TUCK, FIELDS, CLAMAN, SCHRAGE |
2022-03-07 | House | ENE RPT 5DP 2NR |
2022-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2022-02-22 | House | ENE, FIN |
2022-02-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Energy
Environmental Concerns
Funds
Grants
Hydroelectric Projects
Public Finance
Public Utilities
Science & Technology
Sunset
Utilities
Environmental Concerns
Funds
Grants
Hydroelectric Projects
Public Finance
Public Utilities
Science & Technology
Sunset
Utilities