AK HB355 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the crime of criminally negligent burning; relating to protection of and fire management on forested land; relating to prohibited acts and penalties for prohibited acts on forested land; requiring the Alaska Supreme Court to establish a bail schedule; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire;forest Land; Crimes;fire Prevention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendments (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendments (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-23HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2018-07-23HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 7/20 CHAPTER 63 SLA 18
2018-07-17House11:25 AM 7/17/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-27HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-05-11HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y31 N8 E1
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-05-10SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 355(JUD)
2018-05-10SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-05-10SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-10SenatePASSED Y15 N4 E1
2018-05-10SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 355(JUD)
2018-05-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-10SenateJUD SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-10SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-10SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2018
2018-04-23SenateFN2: ZERO(DNR)
2018-04-23SenateFN1: ZERO(LAW)
2018-04-23SenateNR: WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, KELLY, SHOWER
2018-04-23SenateDP: COGHILL
2018-04-23SenateJUD RPT SCS 1DP 4NR SAME TITLE
2018-04-10SenateJUD
2018-04-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-09HouseVERSION: CSHB 355(JUD)
2018-04-09HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-09HouseRECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
2018-04-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK
2018-04-06HouseCHENAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-04-06HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-06HousePASSED Y28 N10 E2
2018-04-06HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 FAILED Y16 N17 E2 A5
2018-04-06HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 355(JUD)
2018-04-05HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/6 CALENDAR
2018-04-05HouseJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-05HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-05HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2018
2018-04-04HouseFN2: ZERO(DNR)
2018-04-04HouseFN1: ZERO(LAW)
2018-04-04HouseAM: EASTMAN, KOPP
2018-04-04HouseNR: LEDOUX
2018-04-04HouseDP: KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES, CLAMAN
2018-04-04HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 3DP 1NR 2AM
2018-03-12HouseFN2: ZERO(DNR)
2018-03-12HouseFN1: ZERO(LAW)
2018-03-12HouseAM: RAUSCHER
2018-03-12HouseNR: BIRCH, PARISH, TALERICO
2018-03-12HouseDP: LINCOLN, DRUMMOND, JOSEPHSON, TARR
2018-03-12HouseRES RPT CS(RES) NT 4DP 3NR 1AM
2018-02-16HouseRES, JUD
2018-02-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback