AK HB355 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/7/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/7/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to criminal fines for organizations.
Title
Criminal Fines For Organizations
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Buch [D] | Rep. Sharon Cissna [D] | Rep. Harry Crawford [D] | Sen. Alberta Gardner [D] |
Rep. Max Gruenberg [D] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] | Rep. James Petersen [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/7/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 54 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:19 PM 6/7/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: CSHB 355(JUD) | |
2010-04-18 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-18 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER, FRENCH, DYSON, DAVIS, EGAN | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 355(JUD) | |
2010-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-04-13 | NR: COGHILL, MCGUIRE | |
2010-04-13 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN | |
2010-04-13 | JUD RPT 2DP 2NR | |
2010-04-08 | JUD | |
2010-04-08 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-07 | VERSION: CSHB 355(JUD) | |
2010-04-07 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-07 | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-06 | COSPONSOR(S): PETERSEN, BUCH, TUCK, GARDNER, CISSNA | |
2010-04-06 | JOHANSEN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2010-04-06 | PASSED Y31 N5 E4 | |
2010-04-06 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 355(JUD) | |
2010-04-06 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-06 | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-06 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-06 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2010 | |
2010-04-05 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-04-05 | NR: KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE | |
2010-04-05 | DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, N.FOSTER | |
2010-04-05 | FIN RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 3NR | |
2010-03-17 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-03-17 | DP: LYNN, GRUENBERG, DAHLSTROM, HOLMES, GATTO, RAMRAS | |
2010-03-17 | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 6DP | |
2010-03-15 | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN | |
2010-02-19 | JUD, FIN | |
2010-02-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |