AK HB349 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/13/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/13/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Statewide Suicide Prevention Council.
Title
Suicide Prevention Council Meetings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/13/10 | |
2010-04-14 | SIGNED INTO LAW 4/14 CHAPTER 5 SLA 10 | |
2010-03-30 | 10:58 AM 3/30/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-03-24 | VERSION: HB 349 | |
2010-03-24 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-03-24 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-03-24 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MENARD, EGAN, MEYER, MCGUIRE, DYSON, DAVIS | |
2010-03-24 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 349 | |
2010-03-24 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-24 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-24 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | FN1: ZERO(DHS) | |
2010-03-23 | DP: DAVIS, THOMAS, PASKVAN, DYSON | |
2010-03-23 | HSS RPT 4DP | |
2010-03-15 | HSS | |
2010-03-15 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-12 | VERSION: HB 349 | |
2010-03-12 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-03-12 | COSPONSOR(S): CISSNA, DAHLSTROM, TUCK, KERTTULA, JOHNSON, CHENAULT | |
2010-03-12 | PASSED Y37 E3 | |
2010-03-12 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 349 | |
2010-03-12 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-12 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-12 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | FN1: ZERO(DHS) | |
2010-03-11 | DP: JOHNSON, GATTO, GRUENBERG, PETERSEN, LYNN | |
2010-03-11 | STA RPT 5DP | |
2010-02-17 | STA | |
2010-02-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |