AK HB342 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-06 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-06 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending and repealing registration filing provisions of the Uniform Land Sales Practices Act; relating to the jurisdiction of the office of administrative hearings; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Land Sales Practices
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-04-06 | Senate | JUD |
2018-04-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-04 | House | VERSION: HB 342 |
2018-04-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-04 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-04 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2018-04-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 342 |
2018-04-04 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 04/04/18 |
2018-02-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-02-28 | House | NR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KNOPP |
2018-02-28 | House | DP: STUTES, WOOL, KITO |
2018-02-28 | House | L&C RPT 3DP 4NR |
2018-02-09 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2018-02-09 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-02-09 | House | L&C |
2018-02-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |