AK HB34 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/26/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/26/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act naming the Vietnam Helicopter Pilots' Memorial Bridge.
Title
Naming Vietnam Heli. Pilots' Mem. Bridge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-31 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/26/21 |
2021-08-31 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/28 CHAPTER 30 SLA 21 |
2021-08-23 | House | 12:35 P.M. 8/23/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-28 | House | FN1: (DOT) |
2021-06-28 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 69 |
2021-06-28 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | VERSION: HB 34 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N- |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2021-05-18 | Senate | HUGHES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2021-05-18 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 34 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | FN1: (DOT) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, VON IMHOF |
2021-05-18 | Senate | FIN RPT 7DP |
2021-05-14 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, BEGICH, VON IMHOF |
2021-05-14 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER TRA |
2021-05-14 | Senate | FN1: (DOT) |
2021-05-14 | Senate | DP: MYERS, MICCICHE, KIEHL, SHOWER |
2021-05-14 | Senate | TRA RPT 4DP |
2021-05-05 | Senate | MICCICHE |
2021-05-05 | Senate | GRAY-JACKSON, WILSON, COSTELLO, MYERS, REINBOLD, KAWASAKI, STEDMAN, BISHOP, |
2021-05-05 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, REVAK, SHOWER, STEVENS, HOLLAND, WIELECHOWSKI, |
2021-05-05 | Senate | TRA |
2021-05-05 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-04 | House | VERSION: HB 34 |
2021-05-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-04 | House | KREISS-TOMKINS, TARR, WOOL, CRONK, KAUFMAN |
2021-05-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, STORY, PATKOTAK, SPOHNHOLZ, NELSON, SCHRAGE, VANCE, |
2021-05-04 | House | PASSED Y36 N2 E2 |
2021-05-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 34 |
2021-05-04 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | FN1: (DOT) |
2021-05-04 | House | MERRICK |
2021-05-04 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, |
2021-05-04 | House | FIN RPT 9DP |
2021-05-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, MERRICK, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, RASMUSSEN |
2021-03-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER |
2021-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON, TUCK |
2021-03-10 | House | FN1: (DOT) |
2021-03-10 | House | DP: CLAMAN, TARR, NELSON, STORY, SHAW, TUCK |
2021-03-10 | House | MLV RPT 6DP |
2021-03-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2021-03-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE |
2021-02-19 | House | FIN REPLACES STA REFERRAL |
2021-02-18 | House | MLV, STA |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |