AK HB34 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/15/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Naming Scott Johnson Memorial Bridge

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Naming Scott Johnson Memorial Bridge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/15/19
2019-05-20HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 5/17 CHAPTER 3 SLA 19
2019-05-14House5:25 PM 5/13/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-04-08SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): STEDMAN, STEVENS, COSTELLO, KIEHL
2019-04-08SenateVERSION: HB 34
2019-04-08SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2019-04-08SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2019-04-08SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 34
2019-04-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-04-08SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-04-08SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2019
2019-04-03SenateFN1: ZERO(DOT)
2019-04-03SenateDP: HUGHES, SHOWER, WILSON, KIEHL
2019-04-03SenateTRA RPT 4DP
2019-03-29SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): BISHOP, COGHILL, MICCICHE, KAWASAKI, HUGHES
2019-03-29SenateTRA
2019-03-29SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-03-27HouseVERSION: HB 34
2019-03-27HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2019-03-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, JACKSON, TILTON, RAUSCHER, THOMPSON
2019-03-27HousePASSED Y37 E2 A1
2019-03-27HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 34
2019-03-27HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-03-27HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-03-27HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2019
2019-03-25HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP
2019-03-22HouseFN1: ZERO(DOT)
2019-03-22HouseDP: STORY, RASMUSSEN, DRUMMOND, CLAMAN, TALERICO, WOOL, STUTES
2019-03-22HouseTRA RPT 7DP
2019-03-11HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SHAW
2019-03-08HouseFN1: ZERO(DOT)
2019-03-08HouseDP: VANCE, LEDOUX, SHAW, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS, FIELDS
2019-03-08HouseSTA RPT 6DP
2019-02-20HouseSTA, TRA
2019-02-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback