AK HB339 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the base student allocation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase Base Student Allocation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 10 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2018-04-17SenateEDC, FIN
2018-04-17SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-15HouseVERSION: HB 339
2018-04-15HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-15HouseRECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
2018-04-14HouseCHENAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-04-14HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y33 N7
2018-04-14HousePASSED Y22 N18
2018-04-14HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 339
2018-04-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2018-04-13HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR
2018-04-13HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y10 N30
2018-04-13HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
2018-04-13HouseAM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2018-04-13HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018
2018-04-12HouseFN3: (EED/FUND CAP)
2018-04-12HouseFN2: (EED)
2018-04-12HouseFN1: ZERO(EED)
2018-04-12HouseAM: WILSON, PRUITT, THOMPSON, TILTON
2018-04-12HouseDP: GARA, KAWASAKI, GRENN, ORTIZ, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-12HouseFIN RPT 7DP 4AM
2018-03-29HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, GUTTENBERG
2018-03-14HouseFN3: (EED/FUND CAP)
2018-03-14HouseFN2: (EED)
2018-03-14HouseFN1: ZERO(EED)
2018-03-14HouseDNP: KOPP
2018-03-14HouseDP: ZULKOSKY, SPOHNHOLZ, PARISH, DRUMMOND
2018-03-14HouseEDC RPT 4DP 1DNP
2018-03-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY
2018-03-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR
2018-02-09HouseEDC, FIN
2018-02-09HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback