AK HB336 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-12 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to supported decision-making agreements to provide for decision-making assistance; and amending Rule 402, Alaska Rules of Evidence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supportive Decision-making Agreements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rule (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Second Reading Advance to Third Reading on the Same Day (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Second Reading Advance to Third Reading on the Same Day (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-12HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-11SenateVERSION: CSHB 336(JUD) AM
2018-05-11SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-11SenateCOURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-11SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-11SenateCOSTELLO, GIESSEL, MACKINNON, BISHOP, KELLY
2018-05-11SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, MEYER, WIELECHOWSKI, GARDNER, EGAN, OLSON, MICCICHE
2018-05-11SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 336(JUD) AM
2018-05-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-11SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-11SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2018
2018-04-25SenateFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2018-04-25SenateDP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, KELLY, SHOWER
2018-04-25SenateJUD RPT 5DP
2018-04-15SenateJUD
2018-04-15SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-14HouseVERSION: CSHB 336(JUD) AM
2018-04-14HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, KAWASAKI, DRUMMOND
2018-04-14HouseCOURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-14HousePASSED Y39 N1
2018-04-14HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N30 A3
2018-04-14HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 336(JUD)
2018-04-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y39 N1
2018-04-14HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2018-04-14HouseJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2018
2018-04-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY, TARR
2018-04-12HouseFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2018-04-12HouseAM: EASTMAN
2018-04-12HouseNR: LEDOUX, REINBOLD
2018-04-12HouseDP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES, CLAMAN
2018-04-12HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2NR 1AM
2018-03-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
2018-03-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KITO, JOHNSTON
2018-03-09HouseFN1: (DHS)
2018-03-09HouseDP: JOHNSTON, CLAMAN, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, TARR
2018-03-09HouseHSS RPT CS(HSS) 6DP
2018-03-02HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2018-02-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN
2018-02-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA
2018-02-07HouseHSS, JUD
2018-02-07HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback