AK HB333 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing a municipality to adopt an ordinance prohibiting certain uses of cellular telephones while driving in school zones or on school property.
Title
Muni: Driver Phone Use In School Zone
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: Remove Judiciary Referral Sustain Ruling of the Chair (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: Remove Judiciary Referral Sustain Ruling of the Chair (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER |
2018-05-01 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-05-01 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N1 E2 |
2018-05-01 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2018-05-01 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2018-04-30 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 333(CRA) AM S |
2018-04-30 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2018-04-30 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER, MEYER |
2018-04-30 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2018-04-30 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 333(CRA) AM S |
2018-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-30 | Senate | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-30 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-30 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-30 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2018 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2018-04-27 | Senate | NR: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN |
2018-04-27 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, GARDNER, MACKINNON |
2018-04-27 | Senate | CRA RPT 3DP 2NR |
2018-04-24 | Senate | CRA |
2018-04-24 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-23 | House | VERSION: CSHB 333(CRA) AM |
2018-04-23 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSTON, GARA, LEDOUX, JOSEPHSON |
2018-04-23 | House | PASSED Y37 N2 E1 |
2018-04-23 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 333(CRA) AM |
2018-04-23 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-23 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2018-04-23 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-23 | House | CRA CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-23 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-23 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | SUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y37 N2 A1 |
2018-04-17 | House | JUD REFERRAL WAIVED MOTION |
2018-04-17 | House | DISCHARGE FROM JUD MOTION WITHDRAWN |
2018-04-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2018-04-13 | House | AM: RAUSCHER |
2018-04-13 | House | DP: LINCOLN, TALERICO, PARISH, ZULKOSKY |
2018-04-13 | House | CRA RPT CS(CRA) 4DP 1AM |
2018-03-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KOPP |
2018-02-07 | House | CRA, JUD |
2018-02-07 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Communications
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Public Safety
Schools
Transportation
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Public Safety
Schools
Transportation