AK HB33 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing May 31 of each year as Katie John Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish May 31 As Katie John Day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2017-04-19HouseREFERRED TO RULES
2017-04-19HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-04-19HouseNR: SADDLER
2017-04-19HouseDP: TALERICO, WESTLAKE, RAUSCHER, DRUMMOND, FANSLER, PARISH
2017-04-19HouseCRA RPT 6DP 1NR
2017-01-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FANSLER
2017-01-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
2017-01-18HouseCRA
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback