AK HB33 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-15 - COSPONSOR(S): MILLER
Pending: House Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the procedures and jurisdiction of the Department of Health and Social Services for the care of children who are in state custody; relating to court jurisdiction and findings pertaining to children who are in state custody; and modifying the licensing requirements for foster care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster Care Licensing/state Custody

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-15 COSPONSOR(S): MILLER
2011-04-08 COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
2011-02-25 REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES
2011-02-25 HSS, JUD, FIN
2011-02-25 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2011-02-25 SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
2011-01-18 HSS, JUD, FIN
2011-01-18 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2011-01-18 PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback