AK HB324 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Violent Crimes Compensation Board.
Title
Violent Crimes Comp Board Membership
Sponsors
Rep. Gabrielle LeDoux [R] | Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Rep. Liz Vazquez [R] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] |
Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] | Sen. Lesil McGuire [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-30 - House - House: CSHB 324(STA) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE |
2016-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-04-06 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | DP: STOLTZE, COGHILL, HUGGINS, MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI |
2016-04-06 | Senate | STA RPT 5DP |
2016-04-01 | Senate | STA |
2016-04-01 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-03-30 | House | VERSION: CSHB 324(STA) |
2016-03-30 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2016-03-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR, JOSEPHSON, SPOHNHOLZ |
2016-03-30 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2016-03-30 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 324(STA) |
2016-03-30 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-03-30 | House | STA CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-03-30 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-03-30 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2016-03-25 | House | DP: SPOHNHOLZ, STUTES, KELLER, TALERICO, VAZQUEZ, KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN |
2016-03-25 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 7DP |
2016-03-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): VAZQUEZ |
2016-02-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT |
2016-02-22 | House | STA |
2016-02-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |