AK HB324 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the crime of failure to appear; relating to arrest for violating certain conditions of release; relating to release before trial, before sentence, and pending appeal; relating to material witnesses; relating to temporary release; relating to release on a petition to revoke probation; relating to the first appearance before a judicial officer after arrest; relating to sentencing restrictions concerning alcoholic beverages; relating to service of process for domestic violence protective orders; making conforming amendments; amending Rules 5 and 41, Alaska Rules of Criminal Procedure, and Rules 206 and 603, Alaska Rules of Appellate Procedure; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Failure To Appear; Release Procedures
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/14 CHAPTER 19 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 11:24 AM 5/10/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 N1 A1 | |
2010-04-18 | TAKE UP CONCUR | |
2010-04-17 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2010-04-17 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 324(JUD) | |
2010-04-17 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-17 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-17 | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-17 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-17 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 324(JUD) | |
2010-04-17 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-17 | JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-17 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-17 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2010 | |
2010-04-16 | FN8: ZERO(H.FIN/CRT) | |
2010-04-16 | FN7: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-04-16 | FN5: ZERO(DPS) | |
2010-04-16 | FN4: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-04-16 | FN3: ZERO(COR) | |
2010-04-16 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-04-16 | NR: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2010-04-16 | DP: FRENCH, EGAN, MCGUIRE | |
2010-04-16 | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 22 | |
2010-04-16 | JUD RPT SCS 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE | |
2010-04-15 | JUD | |
2010-04-15 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-14 | VERSION: CSHB 324(FIN) | |
2010-04-14 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-14 | NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION WITHDRAWN | |
2010-04-14 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY FLD Y25 N15 | |
2010-04-14 | RAMRAS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2010-04-14 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-14 | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-14 | PASSED Y40 | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 324(FIN) | |
2010-04-13 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR | |
2010-04-13 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-13 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-13 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | FN8: ZERO(H.FIN/CRT) | |
2010-04-13 | FN7: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-04-13 | FN5: ZERO(DPS) | |
2010-04-13 | FN4: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-04-13 | FN3: ZERO(COR) | |
2010-04-13 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-04-13 | NR: GARA, N.FOSTER | |
2010-04-13 | DP: THOMAS, DOOGAN, JOULE, FAIRCLOUGH, KELLY, SALMON, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-04-13 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 2NR | |
2010-03-29 | FN6: (CRT) | |
2010-03-29 | FN5: ZERO(DPS) | |
2010-03-29 | FN4: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-03-29 | FN3: ZERO(COR) | |
2010-03-29 | FN2: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-03-29 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-03-29 | AM: HOLMES | |
2010-03-29 | NR: HERRON | |
2010-03-29 | DP: LYNN, DAHLSTROM, GATTO, RAMRAS | |
2010-03-29 | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 1NR 1AM | |
2010-02-03 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2010-02-03 | FN4: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-02-03 | FN3: ZERO(COR) | |
2010-02-03 | FN2: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-02-03 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-02-03 | JUD, FIN | |
2010-02-03 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alcohol
Appeals
Bonds & Bonding
Child Abuse
Court Rules
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Domestic Violence
Drugs
Minors
Sentencing
Witnesses
Appeals
Bonds & Bonding
Child Abuse
Court Rules
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Domestic Violence
Drugs
Minors
Sentencing
Witnesses