AK HB322 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska marine highway system fund; relating to the Alaska marine highway system vessel replacement fund; relating to the Alaska higher education investment fund; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Ak Marine Hwy Funds, Higher Ed Inves Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Add Transportation Committee Referral (Y: 9 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Add Transportation Committee Referral (Y: 9 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/22 |
2022-06-30 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 15 SLA 22 |
2022-06-17 | House | 12:10 P.M. 6/17/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-18 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 322(TRA) AM |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N4 A2 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 322(TRA) AM |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CAL |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RULES TO FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FN2: (S.FIN/FUND TRANSFERS) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | NR: WILSON, OLSON |
2022-05-17 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, VON IMHOF |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FIN RPT 5DP 2NR |
2022-05-03 | Senate | MOTION TO ADD TRA REFERRAL FAILED Y9 N10 E1 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | FIN |
2022-05-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-05-02 | House | VERSION: CSHB 322(TRA) AM |
2022-05-02 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-05-02 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y31 N8 A1 |
2022-05-02 | House | PASSED Y25 N15 |
2022-05-02 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 322(TRA) AM |
2022-04-29 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/2 CALENDAR |
2022-04-29 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED 16 N23 E1 |
2022-04-29 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2022-04-29 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y23 N16 E1 |
2022-04-29 | House | TRA CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-04-29 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-29 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | FN1: (GOV/FUND TRANSFERS) |
2022-04-04 | House | NR: LEBON, THOMPSON, MERRICK |
2022-04-04 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, WOOL |
2022-04-04 | House | FIN RPT CS(TRA) NEW TITLE 4DP 3NR |
2022-03-02 | House | FN1: (GOV/FUND TRANSFERS) |
2022-03-02 | House | DNP: MCKAY, MCCABE, CRONK |
2022-03-02 | House | DP: HANNAN, DRUMMOND, STUTES, HOPKINS |
2022-03-02 | House | TRA RPT CS(TRA) NEW TITLE 4DP 3DNP |
2022-02-14 | House | TRA, FIN |
2022-02-14 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Appropriations
Education
Funds
Marine Highway
Medical Care
Nurses
Physicians
Public Finance
Revenue
Schools
Universities
Vessels
Education
Funds
Marine Highway
Medical Care
Nurses
Physicians
Public Finance
Revenue
Schools
Universities
Vessels