AK HB317 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-16 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to civil in rem forfeiture actions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

No Common Law Civil In Rem Forfeiture

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-16SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2016-04-16SenateFN6: ZERO(DPS)
2016-04-16SenateFN5: ZERO(LAW)
2016-04-16SenateFN4: ZERO(ADM)
2016-04-16SenateFN3: ZERO(ADM)
2016-04-16SenateNR: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI
2016-04-16SenateDP: MCGUIRE, COSTELLO
2016-04-16SenateJUD RPT SCS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
2016-04-15SenateJUD, FIN
2016-04-15SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2016-04-14HouseVERSION: CSHB 317(FIN)
2016-04-14HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2016-04-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LYNN
2016-04-14HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2016-04-14HousePASSED Y39 E1
2016-04-14HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 317(FIN)
2016-04-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2016-04-14HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2016-04-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2016-04-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2016
2016-04-13HouseFN6: ZERO(DPS)
2016-04-13HouseFN5: ZERO(LAW)
2016-04-13HouseFN4: ZERO(ADM)
2016-04-13HouseFN3: ZERO(ADM)
2016-04-13HouseAM: KAWASAKI
2016-04-13HouseDP: MUNOZ, PRUITT, GATTIS, GARA, WILSON, GUTTENBERG, EDGMON, THOMPSON
2016-04-13HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 8DP 1AM
2016-04-05HouseFN2: INDETERMINATE(DPS)
2016-04-05HouseFN1: (LAW)
2016-04-05HouseDP: KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN, CLAMAN, LEDOUX
2016-04-05HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 4DP
2016-04-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
2016-02-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2016-02-17HouseJUD, FIN
2016-02-17HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback