AK HB316 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the release of certain records of convictions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Restrict Access Marijuana Crime Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-04-17 | Senate | FIN |
2018-04-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-15 | House | VERSION: CSHB 316(FIN) AM |
2018-04-15 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-15 | House | PASSED Y30 N10 |
2018-04-15 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-15 | House | AM NO 4 ADOPTED Y37 N3 |
2018-04-15 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UC |
2018-04-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 316(FIN) |
2018-04-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR |
2018-04-14 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y16 N23 A1 |
2018-04-14 | House | AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED |
2018-04-14 | House | AM NO 1 WITHDRAWN |
2018-04-14 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2018-04-14 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND PENDING |
2018-04-14 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2018-04-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(AJS) |
2018-04-12 | House | AM: WILSON, KAWASAKI, TILTON, PRUITT, THOMPSON |
2018-04-12 | House | NR: ORTIZ, GRENN |
2018-04-12 | House | DP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-12 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 2NR 5AM |
2018-02-28 | House | FN2: (DPS) |
2018-02-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(AJS) |
2018-02-28 | House | AM: EASTMAN |
2018-02-28 | House | NR: KOPP, REINBOLD |
2018-02-28 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN |
2018-02-28 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 2DP 2NR 1AM |
2018-02-23 | House | COSPONSOR REMOVED: SPOHNHOLZ |
2018-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2018-01-31 | House | JUD, FIN |
2018-01-31 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |