AK HB316 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to workers' compensation fees for medical treatment and services; relating to workers' compensation regulations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation Medical Fees

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-11HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2014-07-11HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 63 SLA 14
2014-07-02House9:55 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2014-05-15HouseFN4: (LWF)
2014-05-15HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
2014-05-15HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
2014-05-15SenateLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
2014-04-23SenateVERSION: CSHB 316(FIN)
2014-04-23SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2014-04-23SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2014-04-23SenatePASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
2014-04-23SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 316(FIN)
2014-04-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-23SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-22SenateNOT TAKEN UP 4/22 - ON 4/23 CALENDAR
2014-04-21SenateNOT TAKEN UP 4/21 - ON 4/22 CALENDAR
2014-04-21SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/2014
2014-04-19SenateFN4: (LWF)
2014-04-19SenateFN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2014-04-19SenateNR: KELLY, MEYER, OLSON, DUNLEAVY
2014-04-19SenateDP: HOFFMAN, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH
2014-04-19SenateFIN RPT 3DP 4NR
2014-04-16SenateFIN
2014-04-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2014-04-16HouseVERSION: CSHB 316(FIN)
2014-04-16HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2014-04-16HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2014-04-16HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 E2 A2
2014-04-16HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2014-04-16HouseOLSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2014-04-16HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2014-04-16HousePASSED Y35 E2 A3
2014-04-16HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 316(FIN)
2014-04-16HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-16HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-16HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-16HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014
2014-04-15HouseFN4: (LWF)
2014-04-15HouseFN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2014-04-15HouseNR: GUTTENBERG, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
2014-04-15HouseDP: MUNOZ, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, GARA
2014-04-15HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 5NR
2014-03-31HouseFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
2014-03-31HouseFN2: (LWF)
2014-03-31HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2014-03-31HouseNR: HERRON, REINBOLD
2014-03-31HouseDNP: JOSEPHSON
2014-03-31HouseDP: SADDLER, OLSON
2014-03-31HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) 2DP 1DNP 2NR
2014-02-19HouseL&C
2014-02-19HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback