AK HB315 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - REFERRED TO RESOURCES
Pending: Senate Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the confidentiality of certain records on animals and crops; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confidentiality Of Animal & Crop Records

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateREFERRED TO RESOURCES
2018-04-17SenateRES
2018-04-17SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-16HouseVERSION: CSHB 315(RES)
2018-04-16HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-16HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-16HousePASSED Y38 N1 A1
2018-04-16HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 315(RES)
2018-04-15HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/16 CALENDAR
2018-04-15HouseRES CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-15HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-15HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2018
2018-04-04HouseFN1: ZERO(DEC)
2018-04-04HouseNR: BIRCH, PARISH, TALERICO, RAUSCHER, JOHNSON, LINCOLN, TARR, JOSEPHSON
2018-04-04HouseDP: DRUMMOND
2018-04-04HouseRES RPT CS(RES) 1DP 8NR
2018-02-14HouseFN1: ZERO(DEC)
2018-02-14HouseAM: EASTMAN
2018-02-14HouseNR: LEDOUX, MILLETT
2018-02-14HouseDP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN
2018-02-14HouseJUD RPT 3DP 2NR 1AM
2018-01-26HouseGOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
2018-01-26HouseFN1: ZERO(DEC)
2018-01-26HouseJUD, RES
2018-01-26HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback