AK HB314 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the Alaska regional economic assistance program; extending the termination date of the Alaska regional economic assistance program; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ak Reg Econ Assist. Program; Extend

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-28HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2016-07-28HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 7/28 CHAPTER 52 SLA 16
2016-07-11House11:39 AM 7/6/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2016-04-17HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2016-04-17HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1
2016-04-17HouseHELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
2016-04-17SenateVERSION: SCS HB 314(FIN)
2016-04-17SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2016-04-17SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2016-04-17SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2016-04-17SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 314(FIN)
2016-04-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2016-04-17SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2016-04-17SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2016-04-17SenateRULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/17/16
2016-04-17SenateFN1: (CED)
2016-04-17SenateNR: KELLY, DUNLEAVY, OLSON, HOFFMAN
2016-04-17SenateDP: MACKINNON, MICCICHE, BISHOP
2016-04-17SenateFIN RPT SCS 3DP 4NR SAME TITLE
2016-04-13SenateFN1: (CED)
2016-04-13SenateDP: COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MEYER
2016-04-13SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 23
2016-04-13SenateL&C RPT SCS 3DP NEW TITLE
2016-04-04SenateL&C, FIN
2016-04-04SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2016-04-01HouseVERSION: HB 314
2016-04-01HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2016-04-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TILTON
2016-04-01HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2016-04-01HousePASSED Y34 E4 A2
2016-04-01HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 314
2016-04-01HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2016-04-01HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2016-04-01HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2016
2016-03-29HouseFIN REFERRAL WAIVED
2016-03-23HouseFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
2016-03-23HouseFN1: (CED)
2016-03-23HouseNR: TILTON
2016-03-23HouseDP: LEDOUX, COLVER, JOSEPHSON, KITO, HUGHES, OLSON
2016-03-23HouseL&C RPT 6DP 1NR
2016-03-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): COLVER
2016-02-17HouseL&C
2016-02-17HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback