AK HB312 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT, DRUMMOND, GARA
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to scheduled substances; relating to the Controlled Substances Advisory Committee; authorizing the attorney general to schedule substances by emergency regulation or repeal an emergency regulation that scheduled a substance; relating to arrest without a warrant for assault in the fourth degree at a health care facility; relating to detaining a person for up to 48 hours for the prosecuting authority to demonstrate that release of the person would not reasonably ensure the appearance of the person or will pose a danger to the victim, other persons, or the community if the person has a criminal conviction or charge outside the state; relating to conditions of release for a person who is represented by an attorney or has a criminal conviction or charge outside the state; relating to factors the court is required to consider when determining the conditions of release before trial; relating to the surcharge imposed for violation of state or municipal law; relating to an aggravating factor at sentencing for a felony offense against a medical professional at a health care facility; amending the authority of pretrial services officers to make a warrantless arrest or request the court to issue a warrant for arrest; providing that pretrial services, probation, and parole officers may perform duties relating to pretrial services, probation, and parole; amending Rule 41, Alaska Rules of Criminal Procedure; providing for an effective date by amending the effective date of sec. 71, ch. 1, 4SSLA 2017; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes/crim Pro;controlled Subtances;bail

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PRUITT, DRUMMOND, GARA
2018-05-11HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-11HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 30
2018-05-11HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-11HouseCOURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 N1
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-05-10SenateVERSION: SCS HB 312(RLS) AM S
2018-05-10SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-05-10SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-10SenateCOURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-10SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-10SenateKELLY
2018-05-10SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): COGHILL, WILSON, EGAN, VON IMHOF, SHOWER, COSTELLO, OLSON
2018-05-10SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2018-05-10SenateAM NO 3 ADOPTED Y12 N6 E1 A1
2018-05-10Senate...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2018-05-10SenateAM NO 2 ADOPTED UC
2018-05-10SenateAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2018-05-10SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS UC
2018-05-10SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 312(RLS)
2018-05-09SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
2018-05-09SenateRLS SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-09SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-09SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2018
2018-05-09SenateFN8: (DPS)
2018-05-09SenateFN7: ZERO(LAW)
2018-05-09SenateFN6: ZERO(DHS)
2018-05-09SenateFN5: ZERO(DHS)
2018-05-09SenateFN4: ZERO(COR)
2018-05-09SenateFN3: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2018-05-09SenateNR: MACKINNON, KELLY
2018-05-09SenateDP: MEYER, GARDNER, MICCICHE
2018-05-09SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 30
2018-05-09SenateRLS RPT SCS 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE
2018-04-06SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, BISHOP, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, STEVENS, HUGHES
2018-03-21SenateFN2: ZERO(LAW)
2018-03-21SenateFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2018-03-21SenateAM: COSTELLO
2018-03-21SenateDP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, KELLY, SHOWER
2018-03-21SenateJUD RPT 4DP 1AM
2018-02-19SenateJUD
2018-02-19SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-02-16HouseVERSION: HB 312
2018-02-16HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-02-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, JOSEPHSON
2018-02-16HousePASSED Y31 N1 E7 A1
2018-02-16HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 Y5 N27 E7 VI
2018-02-16HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 312
2018-02-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SADDLER, BIRCH
2018-02-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/16 CALENDAR
2018-02-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/14/2018
2018-02-09HouseFN2: ZERO(LAW)
2018-02-09HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2018-02-09HouseAM: EASTMAN, LEDOUX, REINBOLD
2018-02-09HouseDP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES, CLAMAN
2018-02-09HouseJUD RPT 4DP 3AM
2018-01-26HouseJUD
2018-01-26HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback