AK HB312 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-10 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-10 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act creating a low-interest loan program for homeowners who convert their homes to natural gas-fired, propane-fired, biomass, or electric heating or district heat; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Homeowners Energy Conversion Loan Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2012-04-10 | FIN | |
2012-04-10 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-04-09 | VERSION: CSHB 312(FIN) | |
2012-04-09 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-04-09 | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, PETERSEN, SEATON, KERTTULA | |
2012-04-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-09 | PASSED Y38 E2 | |
2012-04-09 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 312(FIN) | |
2012-04-09 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-09 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-09 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-09 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2012 | |
2012-04-06 | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, GARA | |
2012-04-06 | FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV) | |
2012-04-06 | THOMAS | |
2012-04-06 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, JOULE, COSTELLO, EDGMON, DOOGAN, GUTTENBERG, STOLTZE, | |
2012-04-06 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 9DP | |
2012-04-02 | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ | |
2012-03-30 | COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON, EDGMON, AUSTERMAN, HOLMES, DOOGAN | |
2012-02-22 | COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER | |
2012-02-22 | FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV) | |
2012-02-22 | AM: CISSNA | |
2012-02-22 | DP: DICK, AUSTERMAN, FOSTER, SADDLER, GARDNER, MUNOZ | |
2012-02-22 | CRA RPT CS(CRA) NT 6DP 1AM | |
2012-02-03 | CRA, FIN | |
2012-02-03 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |