AK HB311 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - COSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to criminal law and procedure; relating to controlled substances; relating to victims of criminal offenses; relating to probation; relating to sentencing; relating to treatment program credit for time spent toward service of a sentence of imprisonment; relating to the Violent Crimes Compensation Board; relating to permanent fund dividends; relating to electronic monitoring; relating to penalties for violating municipal ordinances; relating to parole; relating to community work service; relating to revocation, termination, suspension, cancellation, or restoration of a driver's license; relating to the duties of the commissioner of corrections; relating to the duties of the Department of Health and Social Services; relating to civil in rem forfeiture actions; providing for an effective date by repealing sec. 193, ch. 36, SLA 2016, sec. 79, ch. 1, 4SSLA 2017, sec. 81, ch. 1, 4SSLA 2017, and sec. 83, ch. 1, 4SSLA 2017; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law;parole;probation;sentencing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseCOSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN
2018-04-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
2018-02-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2018-01-26HouseREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2018-01-26HouseSTA, JUD, FIN
2018-01-26HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback